Trustees BARTON ON SEA METHODIST CHURCH

Charity number: 1135451
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

17 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ann Dean Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
ALAN MOIR Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
JOHN TREVOR HOLDEN BSc Hons Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
GEOFFREY HAVERS MSc BScEng Trustee 28 September 2021
None on record
Dr Christopher John Slade BSc Hons Trustee 13 April 2021
CHRISTCHURCH AND WIMBORNE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SHIRLEY HEWITT Trustee 15 October 2019
None on record
ELIZABETH WARD Trustee 10 May 2016
CHRISTCHURCH AND WIMBORNE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SOUTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
Valerie McCallum Trustee 20 May 2014
None on record
Alison Margaret White Trustee 20 November 2013
None on record
Christopher John Levett Trustee 13 October 2013
None on record
PAMELA RITA MOIR Trustee 15 April 2013
None on record
JOHN EDWARD STOPHER MCIEH Trustee 23 February 2012
None on record
MARGARET PATRICIA HAVERS Trustee 08 April 2011
CHRISTCHURCH AND WIMBORNE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
MICHAEL HAROLD STOPHER Trustee 09 February 2005
CHRISTCHURCH AND WIMBORNE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
Rodney Oliver Betts Trustee
CHRISTCHURCH AND WIMBORNE METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
SOUTHAMPTON METHODIST DISTRICT
Received: On time
THE METHODIST CHURCH ISLE OF WIGHT CIRCUIT
Received: On time
DEREK ANTHONY HANCOCK Trustee
None on record
WENDY MARGARET HANCOCK Trustee
None on record