THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS MATTISHALL AND ST PETER'S MATTISHALL BURGH

Charity number: 1135038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 13 October 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 446 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 10 December 2019 40 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 10 December 2019 40 days late Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 20 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 26 September 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 26 September 2017 On time Download