Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS MATTISHALL AND ST PETER'S MATTISHALL BURGH

Charity number: 1135038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £111.40k £119.78k £114.39k £85.30k £131.79k
Total expenditure £99.66k £108.23k £128.39k £73.67k £101.79k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £400 £500 N/A N/A £20.78k