Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS MATTISHALL AND ST PETER'S MATTISHALL BURGH
Charity number: 1135038

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev MARK ALLAN MCCAGHREY | Chair | 17 January 2013 |
|
|||||
Rev ANDREA RUTH WOODS | Trustee | 30 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MELANIE JANE STEVENSON | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SUSAN MARY CHAPPELL | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALLY THURGILL | Trustee | 22 March 2017 |
|
|||||
PAULINE COX | Trustee | 27 July 2016 |
|
|||||
EDWARD STONE | Trustee | 06 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN ROOTHAM | Trustee | 03 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
SUE COSSEY | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
ALAN COSSEY | Trustee | 23 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
PATRICIA MARIE MENAUL | Trustee | 10 May 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN CLAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA FRANCES CRAWSHAW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JACKIE CLAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID ALEXANDER RUDLING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.