Barnet Hill Foundation

Charity number: 1136046
Charity reporting is up to date (20 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 28/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020
Total gross income £50 £0 £0 £24.89k £38.10k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £12.63k £50.16k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 N/A N/A