WEST STREET CHARITY

Charity number: 1135436
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 23 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 06 August 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 18 September 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 25 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

25 May 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 25 April 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 25 April 2016 On time Download