Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF EMMANUEL, WYLDE GREEN

Charity number: 1135805
Charity reporting is overdue by 264 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022
Total gross income £87.16k £97.63k £47.89k £86.37k £65.99k
Total expenditure £95.11k £94.24k £55.43k £57.54k £63.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £7.50k N/A N/A