Financial history NEW TESTAMENT CHRISTIAN MISSION INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1136444
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019 31/05/2020 31/05/2021
Total gross income £6.35k £4.71k £4.37k £5.41k £1.35k
Total expenditure £4.86k £5.57k £4.24k £4.78k £1.86k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A