NEW TESTAMENT CHRISTIAN MISSION INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advance the Christian faith in Kent, the UK and the World in line with our statements of beliefs. Relieve persons in conditions of need or hardship, the aged and the sick in various parts of the UK or the World. Promote and fulfil such other charitable purposes beneficial to the community as the trustees may from time to time think fit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Kent
Governance
- 18 June 2010: Standard registration
- NTCMI (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr EMMANUEL OLAWALE | Trustee |
|
||||||
PASTOR OLAJIDE ABOLARIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DORCAS KEMI ABOLARIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.41k | £1.35k | £6.28k | £29.37k | £35.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.78k | £1.86k | £4.93k | £9.08k | £19.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 29 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 04 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 28 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 70 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 09 June 2022 | 435 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 13 FEBRUARY 2010
Charitable objects
(A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO IN THE CHATHAM, KENT AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP OR WHO ARE AGED OR SICK AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY IN THE GREATER LONDON AREA AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (C) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN THE GREATER LONDON AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
KENT
Contact information
- Address:
-
18 Mariners View
GILLINGHAM
ME7 2RW
- Phone:
- 07903991170
- Email:
- ntcmlondon@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window