GOALBALL UK

Charity number: 1136892
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £389.98k £265.35k £488.88k £634.78k £673.98k
Total expenditure £346.84k £368.03k £474.47k £562.19k £715.48k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £282.74k £250.14k £362.42k £463.41k £539.51k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A £104.28k £85.45k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £517.79k £542.58k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A £12.72k £45.94k
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A £562.19k £715.48k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A £7.17k £4.62k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A £0 £0