GOALBALL UK

Charity number: 1136892
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ranjit Singh Trustee 17 November 2020 None on record
GRACE CLANCEY Trustee 17 November 2015 None on record
John Grosvenor Chair 15 June 2018 None on record
Katherine Rosemary Coghlan Trustee 07 January 2020 None on record
Paul Mark Reid Trustee 18 November 2020 None on record
Mark Keith Winder Trustee 31 March 2017 None on record
DYFRIG LEWIS SMITH Trustee 17 November 2015 None on record
PETER ELLIOTT Trustee 09 December 2017 None on record
ALISON BURCHELL Trustee 12 November 2015 None on record