Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF FELIXSTOWE, SAINT JOHN THE BAPTIST WITH SAINT EDMUND

Charity number: 1135596
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £105.26k £105.26k £144.31k £120.38k £156.79k
Total expenditure £118.43k £118.43k £185.06k £121.90k £178.03k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £1.00k £20.50k