Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT HARWOOD, ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST JOHN

Charity number: 1136334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £119.40k £86.43k £78.56k £58.99k £101.76k
Total expenditure £96.69k £109.24k £92.04k £73.64k £69.02k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £15.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A