Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF GREAT HARWOOD, ST BARTHOLOMEW AND ST JOHN
Charity number: 1136334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Denise Sheriff | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Yates | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev Graham Birch | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Ferley | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ross Shekleton | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Leslie Kilsby | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Williams | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Ogden | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Entwistle | Trustee | 19 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Shovelton | Trustee | 10 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Janet Houldsworth | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Hall | Trustee | 09 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS Olwen Sudders | Trustee | 31 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
KAREN EXTON | Trustee | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
David Eric Heaton | Trustee | 08 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
MARK EXTON | Trustee | 27 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
CYNTHIA PARKINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOYCE MILLER | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.