NATIONAL SURVIVOR USER NETWORK

Charity number: 1135980
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £276.43k £273.30k £214.93k £236.08k £561.92k
Total expenditure £327.35k £263.81k £258.20k £230.11k £461.13k
Income from government contracts £112.85k N/A £13.13k £20.80k N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £21.46k £167.50k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £516.83k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £45.10k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £440.21k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £20.92k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £46.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £125.28k
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0