Accounts and annual returns THE WORD CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP CENTRE (UK)

Charity number: 1137384
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 12 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 24 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required