THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST BOTOLPH-WITHOUT-BISHOPSGATE

Charity number: 1135985
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
The Revd David Thomas Armstrong Chair 06 November 2018
BISHOPSGATE CHURCH FOUNDATION Received: On time
THE BISHOPSGATE FOUNDATION Received: On time
Christopher Lawrance Trustee 20 May 2021 None on record
MARY MOORE Trustee None on record
Simon Davis Trustee 20 May 2021 None on record
Peter Kibble Trustee 13 November 2019 None on record
Christopher William Butten Trustee 26 April 2012 None on record
WENDY HYDE Trustee 18 April 2018
THE HONOURABLE THE IRISH SOCIETY Received: On time
Christine Anita Ferris Trustee 24 April 2013
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF RUSCOMBE AND TWYFORD Received: On time
Alexander Coles Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
MR FRANK CURTISS Trustee
THE PAROCHIAL COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JAMES, WEST HAMPSTEAD, LONDON Received: On time
THE CHARTERED SECRETARIES' CHARITABLE TRUST Received: On time
BISHOPSGATE CHURCH FOUNDATION Received: On time
MS CHRIS WATKINS Trustee None on record
NICHOLAS CHARLES CRESWICK GOUGH Trustee None on record
ALASTAIR GRAHAME HARRIS Trustee None on record