Financial history ANZA ENTREPRENEURS LIMITED

Charity number: 1137679
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2016 31/10/2017 31/10/2018 31/10/2019 31/10/2020
Total gross income £80.83k £137.85k £79.25k £90.66k £96.30k
Total expenditure £86.93k £117.82k £66.68k £100.37k £98.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A