Financial history TOGETHER SENSE

Charity number: 1135563
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £31.85k £37.27k £41.74k £46.75k £60.77k
Total expenditure £34.28k £38.74k £41.45k £43.53k £48.75k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A