BAHR

Charity number: 1142430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 26 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 26 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 21 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 21 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 21 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 21 May 2018 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2016 15 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2016 15 December 2016 On time Download
Annual return 28 February 2015 25 February 2016 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2015 07 April 2016 101 days late Download