SINAI MAR THOMA CHURCH NORTH LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to live out our faith by doing the Gospel of Jesus Christ. In this mission we will endeavour to work with the host communities and within a multicultural context with humility and sensitivity. We do this in the knowledge of the sufficiency of God's grace to develop the generosity to give and the humility to receive by providing hospitality and welcoming the stranger.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 14 July 2010: Standard registration
- SINAI MT CHURCH-N.LONDON (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Philip Kolaphu | Trustee | 23 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anup John Philip | Trustee | 01 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Papachan | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £94.85k | £60.88k | £111.19k | £114.53k | £90.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.73k | £38.73k | £44.26k | £72.17k | £75.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 06 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION; PROVIDE ITS MEMBERS WITH REGULAR CHRISTIAN WORSHIP SERVICES, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRADITIONS OF THE MAR THOMA SYRIAN CHURCH OF MALABAR; PROVIDE PASTORAL CARE AND ORGANIZE ACTIVITIES TO PROMOTE THE SPIRITUAL LIFE OF ITS MEMBERS; MAKE VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTIONS FOR EVANGELISTIC AND CHARITABLE WORK IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD - ESPECIALLY INDIA. THE CHARITY MAY PARTICIPATE IN COLLABORATIVE PROGRAMMES WITH OTHER CHURCHES WITH WHICH IT HAS COMMUNAL RELATIONSHIPS AND ALSO PARTICIPATE IN ALL ACCEPTABLE ECUMENICAL RELATIONSHIPS AS A FULL MEMBER OF THE WORLD COUNCIL OF CHURCHES (WCC), CHURCHES TOGETHER IN ENGLAND (CTE) AND CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BRITAIN AND IRELAND (CTBI).
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ABROAD - ESPECIALLY INDIA
Contact information
- Address:
-
15 Hampden Road
Harrow
HA3 5PP
- Phone:
- 0203 674 9964
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window