PIT-STOP YOUTH PROJECT LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We offer a service to the local schools in Sheffield for those children who have dropped out or are in danger of dropping out of full-time education by providing those children a centre where they can be in a safe, friendly and secure environment to develop their self-esteem and raise their confidence to enable them to re-intergrate into the school-learning environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 13 October 2010: Standard registration
- 01 September 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 30/06/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £134.01k | £124.09k | £76.18k | £45.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £140.20k | £144.42k | £104.69k | £93.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2015 | 30 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 30 September 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 30 September 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 31 October 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | 31 October 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 DECEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND TRAINING FOR DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE; AND THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY PROMOTING THE MENTAL, EMOTIONAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL WELFARE OF DISADVANTAGED YOUNG PEOPLE IN SOUTH YORKSHIRE; INSPIRED AND GUIDED BY A CHRISTIAN ETHOS.
Area of benefit
SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window