HAKUNA MATATA

Charity number: 1135589
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £75.70k £256.08k £1.80m £283.96k £718.62k
Total expenditure £178.58k £185.70k £157.21k £208.77k £728.47k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A £1.72m N/A £620.48k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A £78.96k N/A £98.13k
Income - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Income - Legacies N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A £152.30k N/A £724.09k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A £4.91k N/A £4.38k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A £3.49k N/A £14.72k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A £4.91k N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A £0 N/A £0