Financial history THE NEW ROOM/JOHN WESLEY'S CHAPEL

Charity number: 1137957
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £1.73m £455.65k £464.04k £446.71k £330.77k
Total expenditure £2.47m £635.16k £414.11k £359.19k £375.94k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £52.67k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.62m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £67.46k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £17.17k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £7.82k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £9.59k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £2.40m N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £66.48k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £4.43k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A