Accounts and annual returns CENTRAL AFRICAN HELP CENTRE

Charity number: 1137705
Charity reporting is overdue by 1632 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 171 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Overdue by 171 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 536 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Overdue Overdue by 536 days
Annual return 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 901 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Overdue Overdue by 901 days
Annual return 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1266 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Overdue Overdue by 1266 days
Annual return 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1632 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1632 days