Financial history CENTRAL AFRICAN HELP CENTRE

Charity number: 1137705
Charity reporting is overdue by 1637 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £8.01k £12.29k £17.50k £13.90k £16.70k
Total expenditure £7.32k £12.29k £16.75k £11.59k £16.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £13.90k £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 £0