Accounts and annual returns STONE OF HOPE CHILDREN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137661
Charity reporting is overdue by 154 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 154 days
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023 Overdue Overdue by 154 days
Annual return 28 February 2022 13 February 2023 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2021 04 January 2022 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 04 January 2022 371 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 12 January 2020 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required