Financial history STONE OF HOPE CHILDREN FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1137661
Charity reporting is overdue by 150 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 28/02/2018 28/02/2019 29/02/2020 28/02/2021 28/02/2022
Total gross income £9.57k £4.72k £2.80k £2.20k £3.00k
Total expenditure £9.62k £8.00k £5.50k £6.00k £10.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A