Accounts and annual returns ROTARY CLUB OF OSSETT TRUST FUND

Charity number: 500908
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2021 16 February 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 December 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2019 04 December 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2018 22 March 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2017 08 December 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 Not Required