Accounts and annual returns NORTH SHROPSHIRE COMMUNITY FIRST RESPONDERS

Charity number: 1136523
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 16 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 15 March 2019 43 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 31 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required