DANCEAID

Charity number: 1140749
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £84.67k £54.13k £66.36k £78.92k £68.20k
Total expenditure £110.08k £64.72k £69.05k £91.72k £70.70k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A