Accounts and annual returns LIVING HEALTH AND EDUCATION FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1138227
Charity reporting is overdue by 112 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2021 Overdue Overdue by 112 days
Annual return 10 October 2020 26 August 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2019 02 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2019 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2018 02 January 2020 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2018 Not Required
Annual return 10 October 2017 21 August 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 10 October 2017 Not Required