HOP SKIP AND JUMP (WEST SUSSEX)

Charity number: 1135618
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Hop Skip and Jump West Sussex provides day care to children and young adults with disabilities, life-limiting illnesses or any other special need in Horsham, West Sussex and surrounding counties.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2017

Total income: £1,439
Total expenditure: £18,804

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • West Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 April 2010: Standard registration
  • 07 March 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2013 31/01/2014 31/01/2015 31/01/2016 31/01/2017
Total gross income £0 £0 £10.19k £49.88k £1.44k
Total expenditure £1.25k £0 £193 £45.82k £18.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £0 £3.00k N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 31 January 2017 10 November 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2016 15 November 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2016 15 November 2016 On Time