EDEN NETWORK GREATER LONDON

Charity number: 1137323
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2021 07 November 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2020 18 February 2021 51 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2019 20 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2019 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2018 08 April 2019 101 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2018 Not Required
Annual return 28 February 2017 09 October 2018 285 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2017 Not Required