Accounts and annual returns HOLY TRINITY THORPE HESLEY (ANGLICAN & METHODIST)
Charity number: 1136178
Charity reporting is overdue by 171 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 171 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Overdue by 171 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2022 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 05 March 2022 | 125 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 January 2021 | 76 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 January 2021 | 76 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 04 November 2019 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 04 November 2019 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window