GREAT PARNDON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1135946
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £632.10k £623.86k £554.29k £537.84k £696.39k
Total expenditure £678.40k £605.58k £546.66k £571.34k £499.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £200.86k
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £600
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £16.29k £4.13k
Income - Charitable activities £618.93k £611.96k £540.85k £0 £456.31k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £832 £450 £116 £133 £169
Income - Other £12.33k £11.45k £13.32k £521.42k £235.18k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £600
Expenditure - Charitable activities £678.40k £605.58k £546.66k £571.34k £499.75k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £2.41k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0