OLD SARUM COMMUNITY ROOM

Charity number: 1135605
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1423 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1423 days
Annual return 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1788 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 Overdue Overdue by 1788 days
Annual return 31 December 2014 16 April 2015 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2014 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2013 21 July 2014 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2012 25 March 2014 145 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 25 March 2014 145 days late