OLD SARUM COMMUNITY ROOM

Charity number: 1135605
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012 31/12/2013 31/12/2014
Total gross income £17.22k £15.71k £27.97k £7.06k £15.56k
Total expenditure £4.10k £20.30k £16.27k £17.52k £15.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A