THE CELESTIAL CHURCH OF CHRIST JEHOVAH ELIYON PARISH

Charity number: 1136801
Charity reporting is overdue by 122 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017 31/05/2018 31/05/2019
Total gross income £31.05k £35.99k £57.37k £46.98k £38.20k
Total expenditure £40.95k £29.73k £30.51k £23.31k £23.09k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A