Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF CEDAR PARK SCHOOL

Charity number: 1135741
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 20 May 2024 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Accounts not yet received
Annual return 31 July 2022 08 June 2023 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 20 May 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 01 May 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 02 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required