Financial history FRIENDS OF CEDAR PARK SCHOOL

Charity number: 1135741
Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £21.44k £8.20k £7.65k £23.77k £28.14k
Total expenditure £25.44k £9.00k £2.61k £5.87k £28.67k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A