"THE NATIVITY OF THE MOTHER OF GOD" ROMANIAN ORTHODOX TRUST

Charity number: 1139040
Charity reporting is up to date (127 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 04 May 2020 09 July 2021 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2020 Not Required
Annual return 04 May 2019 18 October 2020 228 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2019 Not Required
Annual return 04 May 2018 31 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2018 Not Required
Annual return 04 May 2017 27 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2017 Not Required
Annual return 04 May 2016 06 March 2017 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 04 May 2016 Not Required