ROTARY CLUB OF SOUTHPORT LINKS

Charity number: 1136696
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £26.64k £18.46k £24.48k £21.62k £21.85k
Total expenditure £18.68k £19.14k £21.52k £22.64k £16.76k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A