THE ROYAL AIR FORCES ASSOCIATION - SCARBOROUGH BRANCH

Charity number: 500971
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £5.76k £7.80k £8.05k £8.39k £5.58k
Total expenditure £3.35k £2.80k £5.29k £7.69k £15.97k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A