ST IVES ARCHIVE

Charity number: 1136882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 06 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2018 02 August 2019 3 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2018 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2017 28 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2016 19 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2016 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2015 05 July 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2015 Not Required