ST IVES ARCHIVE

Charity number: 1136882
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2015 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 31/03/2020
Total gross income £14.23k £17.30k £15.03k £22.79k £17.45k
Total expenditure £16.85k £15.57k £12.70k £11.06k £23.05k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £500 £0 £0 £500 £500