MONTHLY ALZHEIMER'S SUPPORT EVENING LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The MASE Groups offers friendship to Carers and their cared for who are on the dementia journey. It is a meeting place offering far more than tea and sympathy and is a way of unlocking doors for people, helping to avoid social isolation and enabling them to engage in activities to promote and protect the physical and mental health of their loved ones with Dementia in South Staffordshire.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
29 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 30 July 2010: Standard registration
- MASE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAPHNE BARBARA ANNE SHARP | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Creek | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|||||
David John Degg | Trustee | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
DAVID WILLIAM GODDEN | Trustee | 01 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD LESLIE SHARP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £66.49k | £49.24k | £39.02k | £50.49k | £50.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.22k | £46.27k | £62.64k | £53.20k | £44.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 09 April 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 25 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 15 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM 20 APR 2010 AS AMENDED 27 JULY 2010
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF PEOPLE WITH DEMENTIA AND THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS IN STAFFORDSHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING COUNTIES THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION, PRACTICAL ADVICE AND RECREATIONAL FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
STAFFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 HARTWELL GROVE
STAFFORD
ST16 1RW
- Phone:
- 07939505455
- Email:
- themasegroup@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window