BEYOND FOOD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1136234
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 20 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 20 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 21 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 28 January 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 January 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 17 January 2017 On time Download