Accounts and annual returns BILAL EDUCATION LIMITED
Charity number: 1138797
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 14 June 2023 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 26 May 2022 | On time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 February 2022 | 217 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 15 May 2020 | On time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2018 | 10 January 2020 | 194 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2018 | Not Required |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window