THE CAUGHLEY SOCIETY

Charity number: 1137851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £6.60k £6.18k £4.46k £6.74k £4.39k
Total expenditure £5.31k £3.97k £3.60k £3.51k £5.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A